EP0889525 - Heat sink device for power components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/14] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heinemeyer, Peter Marathonalle 10 14052 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Baumann, Heinrich, Dr. Lauerstrasse 21 76676 Graben-Neudorf / DE | 03 /
Staiger, Wolfgang, Dr. Teckstrasse 14 70188 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/01] | Application number, filing date | 98110999.4 | 16.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | DE1997127912 | 01.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19727912 | [1999/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0889525 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0889525 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/473 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
H01L23/473 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/29] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kühlkörper für Leistungsbauelemente | [1999/01] | English: | Heat sink device for power components | [1999/01] | French: | Elément de refroidissement pour des éléments de puissance | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/17] | 13.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.06.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.06.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE9201158U (ABB PATENT GMBH, 6800 MANNHEIM, DE) [X] 1,3-8 * the whole document *; | [DA]SU860176 (NAKONECHNYJ VLADIMIR F,SU; GOKHMAN EFIM N,SU) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document * |