EP0875583 - Primers and kits for the detection of Chlamydia trachomatis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG 4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Longiaru, Mathew 5 Weber Road West Orange, N.J. 07052 / US | 02 /
Silver, Sheryl Beth 1590 Anderson Avenue Fort Lee, N.J. 07024 / US | 03 /
Sulzinski, Michael Anthony 61 Alan Road Spring Valley, N.J. 10977 / US | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | Best, Michael, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | Best, Michael, Dr., et al Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98111076.0 | 27.09.1990 | [1998/45] | Priority number, date | US19890414542 | 29.09.1989 Original published format: US 414542 | [1998/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0875583 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0875583 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | [1999/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0875583 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6816 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6832 (EP,US);
C12Q1/689 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6816, C12Q2565/519, C12Q2563/131, C12Q2545/114 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6832, C12Q2565/519, C12Q2563/131, C12Q2545/114 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/45] | Title | German: | Primer und Kit für den Nachweis von Chlamydia trachomatis | [1998/45] | English: | Primers and kits for the detection of Chlamydia trachomatis | [1998/45] | French: | Amorces et trousse pour la detection de Chlamydia trachomatis | [1998/45] | Examination procedure | 05.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 15.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90118620.5 / EP0420260 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.1998 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8803957 (GEN PROBE INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * pages 8-24 *; | [X]EP0276591 (TRANSGENE SA [FR], et al) [X] 10 * page 10, line 20 *; | [A]GB2202328 (ORION YHTYMAE OY) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0317077 (CHIRON CORP [US]) [Y] 1-13 * example 6 *; | [PX]EP0336412 (SCLAVO SPA [IT]) [PX] 1-13* the whole document *; | [DY] - HATT ET AL., "Analysis of the entire nucleotide sequence of the cryptic plasmid C. trachomatis serovar L1", NUC. AC RES., 16, 1988, 4053-4067, XP002087847 [DY] 1-13 * the whole document * |