EP0889214 - System to increase the brake power of engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/01] | Method and device to increase the brake power of engines | ||
[2000/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.2001 [2001/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/14] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bäuerle, Emil Kastanienweg 29 73732 Esslingen / DE | [1999/01] | Application number, filing date | 98111378.0 | 20.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | DE1997128350 | 03.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19728350 | [1999/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0889214 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0889214 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | [1999/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0889214 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F02D13/04 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
F02B37/02 (EP);
F02B41/10 (EP);
F02D13/04 (EP);
F02D9/06 (EP);
F02B3/06 (EP);
F02M26/01 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/36] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | System zur Erhöhung der Motorbremsleistung von Brennkraftmaschinen | [2000/16] | English: | System to increase the brake power of engines | [2000/16] | French: | Système pour augmenter l'énergie de freinage de moteurs | [2000/16] |
Former [1999/01] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erhöhung der Motorbremsleistung von Brennkraftmaschinen | ||
Former [1999/01] | Method and device to increase the brake power of engines | ||
Former [1999/01] | Procédé et dispositif pour augmenter l'énergie de freinage de moteurs | Examination procedure | 09.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 22.12.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3900739 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [X] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [X]US5146890 (GOBERT ULRICH [SE], et al) [X] 1,4 * column 5, line 32 - line 6; figure 5 *; | [X]US5404851 (NEITZ ALFRED [DE], et al) [X] 1,4 * column 7, line 4 - line 17; figure 3 *; | [E]US5809964 (MEISTRICK ZDENEK [US], et al) [E] 1,4 * figure 6 *; | [A]US3234923 (FLECK KENNETH J, et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | JPH03117696 | DE19516971 |