blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0908249

EP0908249 - Pressure wire drawing tool with detachable pressure and drawing dies [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tecnovo S.R.L.
Via Fontana, 11
20122 Milano / IT
[1999/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Bellina, Ferruccio
c/o Tecnovo S.R.L., Via Fontana, 11
20122 Milano / IT
[1999/15]
Representative(s)Cicogna, Franco
Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti
Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna
Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1999/15]Cicogna, Franco
Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date98111412.722.06.1998
[1999/15]
Priority number, dateIT1997MI0227306.10.1997         Original published format: IT MI972273
[1999/15]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0908249
Date:14.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0908249
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0908249
Date:16.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationIPC:B21C3/00, B21C3/14
[1999/15]
CPC:
B21C3/04 (EP,US); B21C3/12 (EP,US); B21C3/14 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   LU,   NL,   SE [2000/44]
Former [1999/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Drahtziehwerkzeug mit trennbarer Druck- und Ziehmatrize[1999/15]
English:Pressure wire drawing tool with detachable pressure and drawing dies[1999/15]
French:Outil d'étirage de fil avec matrices de pression et de tréfilage séparables[1999/15]
Examination procedure14.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/19]
29.09.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
04.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.12.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
26.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2001Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
18.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2002Fee for grant paid
30.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination06.02.2002Appeal received
Opposition(s)19.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.04.2003
BE16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
LU22.06.2003
SE16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
[2004/39]
Former [2004/28]AT16.04.2003
BE16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
SE16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/04]AT16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
SE16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/03]AT16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
SE16.07.2003
Former [2004/01]NL16.04.2003
SE16.07.2003
Former [2003/41]SE16.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2088040  (ABRAHAM SIMONS, et al) [X] 1,4-7 * page 2, column R, line 33 - page 3, column L, line 9; figure - * [A] 2,8,9;
 [XA]FR1139790  (NAT RES DEV) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * page 8, column L, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4; figure - * [A] 3;
 [XA]US3740990  (PIASKOWSKI S, et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8 * column 1, line 55 - line 60 * * column 2, line 19 - line 54; figure - * [A] 1,6,9;
 [A]FR2315330  (TREFILUNION [FR]) [A] 1-3* page 7, line 33 - page 8, line 23; figure 6 *;
 [XA]GB2077646  (URALSKY INST CHERNYKH METALL) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * page 1, line 50 - line 60; figure - * [A] 3
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.