blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0887495

EP0887495 - Coupling system for electronic locking devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 19.03.2008  [2008/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Meister, Klaus, Dr.
Am Fischerwinkel 3
D-82031 Grünwald / DE
For all designated states
Meyers, Pierre
Nimrodstrasse 7a
D-85521 Ottobrunn / DE
[1999/01]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/01]
Application number, filing date98111447.322.06.1998
[1999/01]
Priority number, dateDE199712742227.06.1997         Original published format: DE 19727422
[1999/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0887495
Date:30.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/53]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0887495
Date:19.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:E05B47/00
[1999/01]
CPC:
E05B47/068 (EP); E05B2015/0448 (EP); E05B47/0012 (EP)
Designated contracting statesES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/36]
Former [1999/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Koppelsystem für elektronische Verschlusseinrichtungen[1999/01]
English:Coupling system for electronic locking devices[1999/01]
French:Système d'accouplement pour dispositifs de fermeture électroniques[1999/01]
Examination procedure27.05.1999Examination requested  [1999/30]
12.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2001Fee for grant paid
27.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT19.12.2001
ES27.06.2002
[2008/12]
Former [2004/04]ES27.06.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]US4073527  (SCHLAGE LOCK COMPANY) [A] 1 * column 3, line 3 - column 10, line 2; figure - *;
 [A]US5027629  (YIN-CHIC LIU) [A] 1 * column 2, line 5 - column 5, line 34; figure - *;
 [A]EP0709535  (LAPERCHE) [A] 1 * column 4, line 49 - column 10, line 24; figure - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.