EP0926530 - Lens-to-temple joint structure for a pair of eyeglasses. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHARMANT INC. 6-1, Kawasari-cho Sabae-shi Fukui-ken 916-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states CHARMANT INC. 6-1, Kawasari-cho Sabae-shi, Fukui-ken 916-8555 / JP | ||
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOBAYASHI 3-4-2, Ebata-cho, Fukui-shi Fukui-ken 918-8016 / JP | ||
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states Yugen Kaisha Moná JAPAN, Corporation 4-101, Ebata-cho Fukui-shi, Fukui-ken, 918-8016 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Mitsuo 6-9, Ebata-cho Fukui-shi, Fukui-ken 918-8016 / JP | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/26] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98111603.1 | 24.06.1998 | [1999/26] | Priority number, date | JP19970359820 | 26.12.1997 Original published format: JP 35982097 | [1999/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0926530 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G02C5/22 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
G02C5/2209 (EP,US);
G02C1/04 (KR);
G02C2200/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, ES, FR, IT [2000/10] |
Former [1999/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbindungsstruktur zwischen Linse und Bügel einer Brille | [1999/26] | English: | Lens-to-temple joint structure for a pair of eyeglasses. | [1999/26] | French: | Structure de liaison entre verre et branche de lunettes | [1999/26] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 01.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/30] | 25.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09325303 ; | [A]JPH07158334 ; | [A]US1504212 (CARLSON CHARLES O) [A] 1,3-5,7,8 * page 2, line 12 - line 46 *; | [A]FR2658231 (PIARD GERARD [FR]) [A] 1,3-5,7,8 * page 8, line 16 - line 33 *; | [A]DE4341830 (PROKSCH WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1,3,5,7 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 15 *; | [X]EP0667552 (KOBAYASHI MITSUO [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 28 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 098, no. 004, & JP09325303 A 19971216 (TSUURING MEGANE KK) [X] 1,3,5,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 095, no. 009, & JP07158334 A 19950620 (CHIHARU ISHIBE) [A] 1,3-5,7,8 * abstract * |