EP0896794 - Method and apparatus for roasting and cooling beans [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAYEKAWA MFG CO.LTD. 13-1 Botan 2-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/07] | For all designated states MAYEKAWA MFG CO.LTD. 13-1 Botan 2-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinkawa, Kiichiro, UCC Ueshima Coffee Co., Ltd. 7-7, Minatojima-nakamachi 7-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Nakagiri, Osamu, UCC Ueshima Coffee Co., Ltd. 4, Koyo-cho nishi 2-chome, Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Katsuragi, Yasutaka, Mayekawa Mfg. Co. Ltd. 13-1, Botan 2-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Asami, Hisataka, Mayekawa Mfg. Co. Ltd. 13-1, Botan 2-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/07] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [1999/07] | Application number, filing date | 98111620.5 | 24.06.1998 | [1999/07] | Priority number, date | JP19970184390 | 25.06.1997 Original published format: JP 18439097 | [1999/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0896794 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0896794 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A23F5/04, A23N12/08 | [1999/07] | CPC: |
A23F5/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1999/43] |
Former [1999/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Rösten und Kühlen von Bohnen | [1999/07] | English: | Method and apparatus for roasting and cooling beans | [1999/07] | French: | Procédé et installation de torréfaction et de refroidissement de fèves | [1999/07] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 16.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3821450 (STAUBER S) [X] 1,2 * column 8, line 58 - column 9, line 22; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US3332780 (SMITH JR HORACE L) [X] 1,2 * column 11, line 5 - line 53; figure 8; claim 1 *; | [XY]US3189460 (SMITH JR HORACE L) [X] 1,2 * column 13, line 33 - line 70; figures 1,21 * [Y] 4,5; | [X]US5257574 (TORIBA HIROMICHI [JP]) [X] 3 * column 4, line 42 - column 5, line 7; figure 1 *; | [YD]JPS536268 | [YD] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 78, no. 09, Database accession no. 78-16831A, XP002080828 & JPS536268 A 19780120 (KONDO UNYU KIKO KK) [YD] 4,5 * abstract * |