blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0887610

EP0887610 - Pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.08.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Calsonic Kansei Corporation
24-15, Minami-dai 5-chome, Nakano-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
Calsonic Kansei Corporation
24-15, Minamidai 5-chome, Nakano-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
CALSONIC CORPORATION
24-15, 5-chome, Minamidai Nakano-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Saito, Michito
c/o Calsonic Corporation, 24-15, Minamidai 5-chome
Nakano-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1999/01]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98111769.025.06.1998
[1999/01]
Priority number, dateJP1997017032026.06.1997         Original published format: JP 17032097
[1999/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0887610
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/53]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0887610
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0887610
Date:01.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:F28F9/02
[1999/01]
CPC:
B21C37/10 (EP,US); F28F9/0243 (EP,US); F28F2220/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/38]
Former [1999/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Rohr[1999/01]
English:Pipe[1999/01]
French:Tube[1999/01]
Examination procedure03.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/18]
15.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.2003Fee for grant paid
29.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH0735491  ;
 [A]US4461348  (TOGE HIROAKI [JP], et al)[A] 1;
 [A]US5172762  (SHINMURA TOSHIHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0761337  (CALSONIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 12, line 38 - line 50; figure 16 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950630), vol. 1995, no. 05, & JP07035491 A 19950207 (ZEXEL CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *
ExaminationJPH09145293
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.