EP0892256 - Apparatus for detecting the weight of hinged loads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keuper, Gerhard Ditzenbacher Weg 4 71229 Leonberg / DE | [1999/03] | Representative(s) | Thürer, Andreas, et al Bosch Rexroth AG BR/IPR Zum Eisengiesser 1 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Thürer, Andreas, et al Bosch Rexroth AG Intellectual Property Zum Eisengiesser 1 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | ||
Former [2004/18] | Thürer, Andreas, et al c/o Bosch Rexroth AG 97813 Lohr am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 98111820.1 | 26.06.1998 | [1999/03] | Priority number, date | DE1997131089 | 19.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19731089 | [1999/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0892256 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0892256 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01G19/08 | [1999/03] | CPC: |
G01G19/083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/39] |
Former [1999/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Gewichtsbestimmung von angelenkten Lasten | [1999/03] | English: | Apparatus for detecting the weight of hinged loads | [1999/03] | French: | Dispositif pour déterminer le poids de charges articulées | [1999/03] | Examination procedure | 20.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/37] | 11.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 19.08.2004 | [2004/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2499053 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [A] 1,9 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 1 *; | [A]DE3629244 (AHRENS CARSTEN PROF DR) [A] 1,9 * page 3, line 61 - page 4, line 6 *; | [AD]DE3820757 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [AD] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [AD]US5070953 (KYRTSOS CHRISTOS T [US], et al) [AD] 1,9 * column A *; | [A]EP0496166 (MOBILE COMPUTING CORP [CA]) [A] 1,9 * claims 1,7 *; | [A]DE4328145 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,9* abstract * |