EP0887234 - Steering column stick switch assembly for a vehicle and manufacturing method therefore [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/01] | Assembly for top of vehicle steering column and manufacturing procedure | ||
[2002/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO ELECTRONIQUE 2, rue Ferdinand Pouillon 94000 Creteil / FR | [1999/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huynh, Tan Duc 46, avenue Paul Doumer 93330 Neuilly Sur Marne / FR | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Management Services Propriété Industrielle 2 Rue André Boulle B.P. 150 94017 Créteil / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Management Services, Propriété Industrielle, 2, rue André Boulle - B.P. 150 94017 Créteil / FR | Application number, filing date | 98111902.7 | 26.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | FR19970008098 | 27.06.1997 Original published format: FR 9708098 | [1999/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0887234 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0887234 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
B60R16/027 (EP);
H05K1/141 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1999/36] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeug-Lenkstockschalteranordnung und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2002/36] | English: | Steering column stick switch assembly for a vehicle and manufacturing method therefore | [2002/36] | French: | Ensemble de commutation de haut de colonne de direction de véhicule automobile et procédé de fabrication d'un tel ensemble | [1999/01] |
Former [1999/01] | Kraftfahrzeug- Lenksäulenoberteil- Schaltanordnung und Herstellungsverfahren | ||
Former [1999/01] | Assembly for top of vehicle steering column and manufacturing procedure | Examination procedure | 07.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/31] | 16.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3306285 (B & B BETEILIGUNG [DE]) [A] 1,4,6-10 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2455531 (VENTURINI GIANCARLO [IT]) [A] 1,6-9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3420358 (AISIN SEIKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3111029 (NIPPON SOKEN [JP]) [A] 1,6-9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3522907 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,6-9 * the whole document * | Examination | WO9842540 |