EP0888921 - Control for the drive unit of a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Achleitner, Erwin, Dr. Höflinger Ring 19 93083 Obertraubling / DE | 02 /
Graf, Friedrich Charles-Lindbergh-Strasse 2 93049 Regensburg / DE | [1999/01] | Application number, filing date | 98111919.1 | 26.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | DE1997127993 | 01.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19727993 | [1999/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0888921 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0888921 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0888921 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60K41/06, F16H59/74 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/04 (EP,US);
B60W10/11 (EP,US);
B60W30/18 (EP,US);
B60W30/1819 (EP,US);
F02D41/023 (EP,US);
F02D41/027 (EP,US);
F02D41/3029 (EP,US);
F16H61/0213 (EP,US);
B60W2710/0622 (EP,US);
F16H59/74 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US);
Y02T10/84 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/51] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Steuerung für den Antriebsstrang eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [1999/01] | English: | Control for the drive unit of a motor vehicle | [1999/01] | French: | Commande de l'ensemble de propulsion d'un véhicule à moteur | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 17.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0697510 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,6 * page 4, line 44 - line 51 * * claims 19-23,41,42 * * abstract *; | [A]EP0598917 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,6 * column 8, line 1 - line 6 * * column 18, line 24 - line 34 * * abstract *; | [A]DE3830938 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5311794 (TAKADA MITSURU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE19522165 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * |