EP0888826 - Device for applying glue on a web [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.02.2002 [2002/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voack GmbH & Co. Lenzing 39 5760 Saalfelden / AT | [1999/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voack, Norbert, Dr. Bachwinkl 84 5760 Saalfelden / AT | [2001/10] |
Former [1999/01] | 01 /
Voack, Norbert, Dr. Bachwinkel 84 5760 Saalfelden / AT | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98112087.6 | 30.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | DE19972011412U | 30.06.1997 Original published format: DE 29711412 U | [1999/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0888826 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0888826 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | [1999/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0888826 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B05C1/10, B41F15/08, B05C11/04 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
B05C1/10 (EP);
B05C1/003 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/01] | B05C1/10, B41F15/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [2000/15] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Auftragen von Kleber auf Bahnmaterial | [1999/01] | English: | Device for applying glue on a web | [1999/01] | French: | Dispositif d'application de colle sur un matériau en bande | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 28.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 28.05.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 06.12.1999 | Observations by third parties | 27.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 05.02.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, MC, PT, SE | 14.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.02.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.02.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.02.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.02.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.02.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.02.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.02.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.02.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.02.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4299164 (JONKERS THOMAS M) [A] 8,9 * column 4, line 29 - line 33 * * column 4, line 41 - line 62 * * figures 8,10,11 *; | [A]US4444105 (MITTER MATHIAS [DE]) [A] 1,13 * column 7, line 1 - line 21 ** figure 3 *; | [XA]DE3318579 (KNOBEL EUGEN) [X] 1,2,4,7 * page 8, line 13 - line 14 * * page 12, line 23 - page 13, line 30 * * page 14, line 18 - line 31 * * abstract * [A] 3,5,6,10; | [PX]DE19736563 (TRANS TEXTIL GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1 * abstract * | other | DE7443353U | DE3101766 | EP0011314 | DE3318579 | CH648497 | DE3401886 | CH663310G | - "AUSSCHNITT", ZEICHNUNG VILLARS MACHINENBAU, XX, XX, XX, (19991216), page 01/02, XP000889436 |