Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0888951
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
12.09.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.10.2003 [2003/44] |
21.09.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] |
14.08.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.04.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.01.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
11.01.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.12.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
26.10.2001 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.12.2001 [2001/50] |
18.09.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
10.08.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 26.09.2001 [2001/39] |
09.08.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.07.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.02.2001 |
First examination report |
|
22.02.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
24.11.2000 |
Publication of search report |
published on 10.01.2001 [2001/02] |
08.08.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.11.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.01.1999 [1999/01] |
20.11.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.01.1999 [1999/01] |