Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0893711
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
22.06.2001 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 08.08.2001 [2001/32] |
21.02.2001 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
02.01.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
09.11.2000 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
09.11.2000 |
Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973) |
|
03.11.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] |
31.08.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
25.02.2000 |
Publication of search report |
published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] |
25.02.2000 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] |
11.12.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.01.1999 [1999/04] |