EP0893711 - Strip-loaded optical waveguide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2001 [2001/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buck, Martin Hoheneckstrasse 28 81243 München / DE | [1999/04] | Application number, filing date | 98112176.7 | 01.07.1998 | [1999/04] | Priority number, date | DE1997132180 | 25.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19732180 | [1999/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0893711 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0893711 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/12, G02B6/42 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
G02B6/4214 (EP);
G02B6/122 (EP);
G02B6/42 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/04] | G02B6/12 | Designated contracting states | [2000/51] |
Former [1999/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Streifenbelasteter optischer Wellenleiter | [1999/04] | English: | Strip-loaded optical waveguide | [1999/04] | French: | Guide d'ondes optiques chargé par ruban | [1999/04] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/32] | 27.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.11.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.11.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH09145945 ; | [Y]EP0762168 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [Y] 1-5 * column 3, lines 26-29; figure 1 *; | [Y] - HILLERINGMANN U ET AL, "OPTOELECTRONIC SYSTEM INTEGRATION ON SILICON: WAVEGUIDES, PHOTODETECTORS, AND VLSI CMOS CIRCUITS ON ONE CHIP", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19950501), vol. 42, no. 5, ISSN 0018-9383, pages 841 - 846, XP000500494 [Y] 1-3,4,5 * figure 1 * * page 844, column 1, lines 6-8; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/16.381978 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09145945 A 19970606 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM INC) [Y] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PETERS D ET AL, "INTEGRATED OPTICAL DEVICES WITH SILICON OXYNITRIDE PREPARED BY PECVD ON SI AND GAAS SUBSTRATES", US,BELLINGHAM, SPIE, (1990), pages 338 - 349, XP000236395 [A] 1,2,4,5 * page 338 * * page 342 * | [A] - YOKOYAMA S ET AL, "OPTICAL WAVEGUIDES ON SILICON CHIPS", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART A,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, (19950501), vol. 13, no. 3, PART 01, ISSN 0734-2101, pages 629 - 635, XP000531568 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.579797 |