EP0889206 - Variable valve actuation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2001 | Refusal of application | published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNISIA JECS CORPORATION 1370, Onna Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-8510 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states UNISIA JECS CORPORATION 1370, Onna Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-8510 / JP | ||
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states UNISIA JECS CORPORATION 1370, Onna Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-8510 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Nobutaka c/o UNISIA JECS CORP., 1370, Onna, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-8510 / JP | 02 /
Sawada, Takanori c/o UNISIA JECS CORP., 1370, Onna, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-8510 / JP | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Weber, Joachim, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Weber, Joachim, Dr., et al Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98112204.7 | 01.07.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | JP19970175621 | 01.07.1997 Original published format: JP 17562197 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0889206 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/26, F01L1/18 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
F01L1/267 (EP,US);
F01L1/185 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | IT [1999/46] |
Former [1999/37] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Variable Ventilbetätigungsvorrichtung | [1999/01] | English: | Variable valve actuation apparatus | [1999/01] | French: | Dispositif variable de commande de soupape | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 03.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2001/36] | 09.03.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/36] | Request for further processing for: | 17.09.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 17.09.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.10.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5570664 (NOHARA TSUNEYASU [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 6 - line 28; figure 5 *; | [A]GB2273743 (UNISIA JECS CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * page 22, line 32 - page 23, line 2 * * page 10, line 13 - line 30 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE2753197 (EATON CORP) [A] 1 * page 11, line 12 - line 37; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0305693 (CUMMINS ENGINE CO INC [US]) [A] 1 * column 8, line 21 - line 43; figures 4,5 *; | [PA]DE19706769 (UNISIA JECS CORP [JP]) [PA] 1 * figure 18 * |