EP0894888 - Powdery crosslinkable textile binder composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker-Chemie GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [1999/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kohlhammer, Klaus, Dr. Seidl-Ainoeder-Strasse 7 84533 Marktl / DE | 02 /
Goetze, Richard, Dr. Seltenhornstrasse 11 84489 Burghausen / DE | 03 /
Haerzschel, Reinhard, Dr. Carl-Bosch-Strasse 7 84489 Burghausen / DE | 04 /
Hashemzadeh, Abdulmajid, Dr. Hoelzlweg 26 84508 Burgkirchen / DE | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Schuderer, Michael, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Schuderer, Michael, Dr., et al Wacker-Chemie GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98112246.8 | 02.07.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | DE1997133133 | 31.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19733133 | [1999/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0894888 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0894888 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/263, D06M15/333, D06M15/233, D06M15/248, D06M15/33, D04H1/64, D04H1/60, D06M23/08 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
D04H1/435 (EP,US);
C08L101/08 (KR);
B29B15/10 (EP);
C08F2/24 (KR);
C08F218/08 (KR);
C08F8/44 (EP,US);
C08K7/02 (KR);
D04H1/4209 (EP,US);
D04H1/4218 (EP,US);
D04H1/425 (EP,US);
D04H1/4258 (EP,US);
D04H1/4266 (EP,US);
D04H1/4291 (EP,US);
D04H1/4334 (EP,US);
D04H1/587 (EP,US);
D04H1/60 (EP,US);
D04H1/64 (EP,US);
D06M15/233 (EP,US);
D06M15/248 (EP,US);
D06M15/263 (EP,US);
D06M15/333 (EP,US);
D06M15/55 (EP,US);
D06M23/08 (EP,US);
C08F2800/20 (EP,US);
C08F2810/20 (EP,US);
C08L2201/02 (KR);
C08L2203/16 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08F8/44, C08F212/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/41] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Pulverförmige, vernetzbare Textilbinder-Zusammensetzung | [2000/27] | English: | Powdery crosslinkable textile binder composition | [1999/05] | French: | Composition liante pour textile sous forme de poudre | [1999/05] |
Former [1999/05] | Pulverförmige, vernetzbare Textilbinder-Zusammenseztung | Examination procedure | 02.07.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 10.07.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 10.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 16.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2340389 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 4, line 14 - line 19; claim - *; | [A]EP0164554 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US4943612 (MORITA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 9 * * column 14, line 22 - line 24 * * column 20, line 7 - column 22, line 25; claim - *; | [A]WO9222603 (DSM NV [NL]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0590702 (ENIRICERCHE SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 29 - line 43 *; | [A]EP0731207 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO9742367 (BUCK GEORGE S [US]) [PA] 1* claim - * |