Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0889296 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2002 | B1 | EP0889296 | 07.01.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19728740 | 04.07.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19728740 | 06.07.2000 | C2 | DE19728740 | 07.01.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19728740 | 04.07.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59805761D1 | 07.11.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19728740 | 04.07.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2182187T | 01.03.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE19728740 | 04.07.1997 |