EP0890625 - Aqueous adhesive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker Chemical Corporation 3301 Sutton Road Adrian, MI 49221-9397 / US | [2014/21] |
Former [2010/04] | For all designated states Wacker Chemical Corporation 3301 Sutton Road Adrian, MI 49221-9397 / US | ||
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daniels, Christian Leonard 7438 Catalpa Drive Macungie, PA 18062 / US | 02 /
Lorenz, Randolph John 132 Kathleen Lane Wyomissing, PA 19610 / US | 03 /
Goddard, Richard Joseph 821 Stockton Drive Souderton, PA 18964 / US | [1999/02] | Representative(s) | Schuderer, Michael, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | Schuderer, Michael, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/04] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1999/02] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98112498.5 | 06.07.1998 | [1999/02] | Priority number, date | US19970890436 | 09.07.1997 Original published format: US 890436 | [1999/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0890625 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0890625 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0890625 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09J131/04 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
C09J131/04 (EP,KR,US);
C09J123/04 (KR);
C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C08L29/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09J131/04, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT, NL, SE [1999/38] |
Former [1999/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wässriges Klebmittel | [1999/02] | English: | Aqueous adhesive | [1999/02] | French: | Adhésif aqueux | [1999/02] | Examination procedure | 01.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 30.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.08.2006
23.12.2013
WITHDRAWN Celanese Emulsions GmbH Frankfurterstr. 111 61476 Kronberg / DE Opponent's representative Kinkeldey, Daniela Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.08.2006
23.12.2013
WITHDRAWN Celanese Emulsions GmbH Frankfurterstr. 111 61476 Kronberg / DE Opponent's representative Kinkeldey, Daniela Bird & Bird LLP Pacellistrasse 14 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.08.2006
25.08.2006
ADMISSIBLE Celanese Emulsions GmbH Frankfurterstr. 111 61476 Kronberg / DE Opponent's representative Kinkeldey, Daniela Bird & Bird LLP Pacellistrasse 14 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.08.2006
Celanese Emulsions GmbH Frankfurterstr. 111 61476 Kronberg / DE Opponent's representative Ackermann, Joachim Postfach 11 13 26 60048 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 27.09.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.01.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M07) | 28.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 29.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M07) | 03.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 21.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.11.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.11.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.12.2013 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 03.04.2014 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 19.12.2011 | Appeal received No. T2572/11 | 09.03.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.12.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1564100 (AIR REDUCTION COMP INC) [X] 1* claim 1 * | Opposition | DE2045331 | US3714105 | DE2301099 | DE2949154 | WO9719132 | EP1095995 | - ASTM-D-4065-95 | - ASTM-D-5026-95 | - HAINES, P.J., Thermomechanical, dynamic mechanical & dielectric methods, CAMBRIDGE, ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 4, pages 94 - 104 | - Technisches Merkblatt Miwilith® DM137, Februar 1993 | - Datenblatt DUR-O-SET® 78-6411, 1995 | - Lack- und Polymerfilme, Viskoelastische Qualitätsmerkmale, HANNOVER, CURT R. VINCENTS VERLAG, (1996), pages 32 - 33 | - PETER, A. LOVELL ET AL., Emulsion Polymerization and Emulsion Polymers, NEW YORK, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD., (1997), pages 228-229 - 628-629 | - Historical Revisions for ASTM D5026 | - http://www.rheoinstruments.comlviewartikel.php?id=1015 (09.04.2008) | - Mowolith® DM137, Technical Data Sheet, Version 2 - Issue 2006103 | - DR. REINHOLD MÜLLER ET AL., "Möglichkeiten und Grenzen des Einsatzes wäßriger Dispersionen für heißsiegelfähige Klebstoffe", KUNSTHARZ NACHRICHTEN, (19871024), pages 16 - 18 | - DR. REINHOLD MÜLLER ET AL., "Neu im Programm", KUNSTHARZ NACHRICHTEN, (19881125), page 32 | - H. YILDIRIM ERBIL, Vinyl Acetate Emulsion Polymerization and Copolymerization with Acrylic Monomers, FLORIDA, CRC PRESS LLC, (2000), pages 140 - 141 |