blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0879777

EP0879777 - Automatic feeder for processing the return of unsold articles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.06.2000
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.06.2000Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.08.2000 [2000/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemsa Norte, S.A.
c/ Puerto Real Bidea, n 1
48150 Lujua (Vizcaya) / ES
[1998/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Azcarraga Rodero, Gotzon
Chile portal 2A-4
01009 Vitoria (Alava) / ES
[1998/48]
Representative(s)Ungria López, Javier, et al
Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78
28043 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [1998/48]Ungria Lopez, Javier, et al
Avda. Ramon y Cajal, 78
28043 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date98112638.626.01.1994
[1998/48]
Priority number, dateES1993000013827.01.1993         Original published format: ES 9300138
ES1993000042203.03.1993         Original published format: ES 9300422
[1998/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0879777
Date:25.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:B65H1/08, B65H3/08
[1998/48]
CPC:
B65H1/025 (EP); B07C3/08 (EP); B07C5/3412 (EP);
B65H3/0816 (EP); B65H31/309 (EP); B65H2301/324 (EP);
B65H2301/42268 (EP); B65H2406/342 (EP); B65H2513/50 (EP);
B65H2701/176 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
B65H2513/50, B65H2220/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [1998/48]
TitleGerman:Automatische Zuführvorrichtung zum Verarbeiten von zurückgelieferten nichtverkauften Produkten[1998/48]
English:Automatic feeder for processing the return of unsold articles[1998/48]
French:Dispositif automatique d'alimentation pour traiter des produits retournés invendus[1998/48]
Examination procedure05.08.1998Request for accelerated examination filed
20.05.1999Examination requested  [1999/29]
20.07.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.07.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
01.02.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2000/33]
13.03.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2000/33]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP94905110.6  / EP0649685
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
08.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
08.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
28.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200007   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3515068  (STAUFNER HELMUT) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3605037  (STAUFNER HELMUT) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3718217  (STOBB R ET AL) [A] 1-9 * column W *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.