EP0893118 - Saturated alkylsubstituted N-mercaptoacetyl-heterocycles, agent and method for permanently shaping hair based thereon and processes for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wella Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | [1999/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dannecker, Beate, Dr. Gagernstrasse 4 64283 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Lang, Günther, Dr. Auf der roten Erde 10B 64354 Reinheim / DE | 03 /
Hanefeld, Wolfgang, Prof. Dr. Sandweg 50 35037 Marburg/Lahn / DE | 04 /
Walther, Heiko. Dr. Friedrichstrasse 16 35037 Marburg/Lahn / DE | [1999/04] | Application number, filing date | 98112694.9 | 09.07.1998 | [1999/04] | Priority number, date | DE1997132079 | 25.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19732079 | [1999/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0893118 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0893118 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/09, C07D295/088, C07C323/52 | [1999/04] | CPC: |
A61Q5/04 (EP,US);
A61K8/49 (EP,US);
A61K8/4913 (EP,US);
A61K8/4926 (EP,US);
C07D207/16 (EP,US);
C07D295/185 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/40] |
Former [1999/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gesättigte, alkylsubstituierte N-Mercaptoacetyl-Heterocyclen, Mittel und Verfahren zur dauerhaften Haarverformung auf deren Basis sowie Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1999/04] | English: | Saturated alkylsubstituted N-mercaptoacetyl-heterocycles, agent and method for permanently shaping hair based thereon and processes for their preparation | [1999/04] | French: | N-mercaptoacetyl-hétérocycles saturés, alkyl-substitués, agent et méthode pour la déformation permanente de cheveux à base de ceux-ci et procédé pour leur préparation | [1999/04] | Examination procedure | 23.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/12] | 14.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0126013 (SANOFI SA [FR], et al) [X] 10[A] 9; | [A]EP0368763 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-10; | [DA]EP0455457 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [DA] 1-8; | [A]WO9306817 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-8; | [PX]DE19618445 (WELLA AG [DE]) [PX] 1,3-8,10 |