EP0918445 - Optical energy selector apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (A Delaware Corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [1999/21] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baney, Douglas M. 897 Clinton Road Los Altos, California 94024 / US | [1999/21] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Roland Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98112899.4 | 10.07.1998 | [1999/21] | Priority number, date | US19970976187 | 21.11.1997 Original published format: US 976187 | [1999/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0918445 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0918445 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/00 | [1999/21] | CPC: |
G02B6/29319 (EP,US);
G02B6/29322 (EP,US);
H04J14/02 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0005 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0009 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/03] |
Former [1999/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Schalten von optischer Energie | [1999/21] | English: | Optical energy selector apparatus and method | [1999/21] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de sélection d'énergie optique | [1999/21] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 27.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/52] | 01.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US5446809 (FRITZ DANIEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-10 * the whole document * [A] 6 [Y] 5; | [DA]US5457760 (MIZRAHI VICTOR [US]) [DA] 1-10* figure 1 *; | [YA]WO9731504 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 5 * page 19, line 10 - line 15 * * page 23, line 1 - page 25, line 10; figure 8 * [A] 1-4,6-10 |