blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0972645

EP0972645 - Belt drive arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 23.12.2009  [2009/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Guillén, Roberto
Avda. Francesc Macià, 41 5-3
08206 Sabadell / ES
02 / Angulo, Emilio
C/Castillejos, 203 Atico 1
08013 Barcelona / ES
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Yennadhiou, Peter, et al
Hewlett Packard Espanola S.A.
Legal Department
Avda. Graells, 501
08190 Sant Cugat del Vallès (B) / ES
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Yennadhiou, Peter, et al
Hewlett Packard Espanola S.A. Legal Department Avda. Graells, 501
08190 Sant Cugat del Vallès (B) / ES
Former [2000/03]Yennadhiou, Peter, et al
Hewlett Packard Espanola, S.A., Barcelona Division, Avda. Graells, 501
08190 Sant Cugat del Vallès (B) / ES
Application number, filing date98113230.116.07.1998
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972645
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972645
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.1999
ClassificationIPC:B41J19/00, F16G1/28, F16H9/06
[2000/03]
CPC:
F16H19/06 (EP,US); B41J19/005 (EP,US); F16G1/28 (EP,US);
F16H7/023 (EP,US); F16H7/18 (EP,US); F16H2019/0686 (EP,US);
F16H2055/363 (EP,US); Y10T74/18152 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2000/39]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Riemengetriebe[2000/03]
English:Belt drive arrangement[2000/03]
French:Agencement d'entrainement par courroie[2000/03]
Examination procedure03.02.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
07.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.08.2002Fee for grant paid
14.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US4044882  (WEINKE ROBERT, et al) [X] 1,9 * column 2, line 41 - line 52 *;
 [X]JPS63173676  ;
 [X]US4634409  (JOHNSON DAVID W [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9,14-16 * column 1 - column 5 *;
 [X]EP0389741  (BRECO KUNSTSTOFF [DE]) [X] 1-3,8,9,14-16 * column 1 - column 3 *;
 [X]JPS58214053  ;
 [X]JPS58203257  ;
 [X]CH687272  (RENE STEINMETZ [CH]) [X] 1-3,8,9,14-16 * column 1 *;
 [X]US2770977  (RICHARD BECKADOLPH, et al) [X] 1-3,8,9,14-16 * column 1 - column 3 *;
 [X]US4571224  (ARINAGA KUNIOMI [JP]) [X] 1-3,8,9,14-16 * column 1 - column 5 *;
 [X]JPH0681913  ;
 [X]EP0432604  (ALCATEL SATMAM [FR]) [X] 1,9 * column 1 - column 5; figure 3 *;
 [A]DE3537464  (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1 - column 3 *;
 [DA]US4761154  (BEAUCHAMP ROBERT W [US], et al);
 [DA]US5276970  (WILCOX DARREN W [US], et al)
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881121), vol. 012, no. 442, Database accession no. (M - 766), & JP63173676 A 19880718 (CANON INC) [X] 1,9 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840327), vol. 008, no. 064, Database accession no. (M - 285), & JP58214053 A 19831213 (ITOU KOGYO KK) [X] 1-3,8,9,14-16 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840307), vol. 008, no. 050, Database accession no. (M - 281), & JP58203257 A 19831126 (HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KK) [X] 1-3,8,9,14-16 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940628), vol. 018, no. 341, Database accession no. (M - 1629), & JP06081913 A 19940322 (RICOH CO LTD) [X] 1,9 * abstract *
by applicantUS4761154
 US5276970
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.