EP0899250 - Méthode pour executer un procédé dans un four pour la cuisson d' anodes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovatherm Prof. Dr. Leisenberg GmbH & Co. KG Roter Lohweg 22 35510 Butzbach / DE | [2004/32] |
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states Innovatherm Prof. Dr. Leisenberg GmbH + Co. KG Roter Lohweg 22 D-35510 Butzbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leisenberg, Wolfgang, Dr.-Ing. Professor Rosenstrasse 19 671231 Bad Nauheim / DE | [1999/09] | Representative(s) | Engelhardt, Guido Patentanwalt Montafonstrasse 35 88045 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | Engelhardt, Guido, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Montafonstrasse 35 88045 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98113341.6 | 17.07.1998 | [1999/09] | Priority number, date | DE1997136950 | 25.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19736950 | DE1998127361 | 19.06.1998 Original published format: DE 19827361 | [1999/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0899250 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0899250 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | [2001/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0899250 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/532, F27B13/14, F27D19/00 | [1999/09] | CPC: |
C04B35/532 (EP);
F27B13/14 (EP);
F27D19/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2002/27] |
Former [2002/23] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, LI | ||
Former [1999/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Prozessführung eines Anodenbrennofens | [1999/09] | English: | Méthode pour executer un procédé dans un four pour la cuisson d' anodes | [1999/09] | French: | Method for running a process in an anode firing furnace | [1999/09] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 13.03.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 16.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.05.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 04.08.2004 | NL | 04.08.2004 | ES | 15.11.2004 | [2008/12] |
Former [2006/24] | NL | 04.08.2004 | |
ES | 15.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | ES | 15.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9119147 (ALCOA AUSTRALIA, MELBOURNE, AU) [A] 1-12 * page 1, line 3 - line 7 * * page 6, line 9 - line 17 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US4859175 (DREYER CHRISTIAN ET AL, SAINT JEAN DE MAURIENNE, FR) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 47 *; | [A]DD280377 (ELEKTROKOHLE LICHTENBERG VEB, BERLIN, DE) [A] 1-12 * whole document * |