EP0894704 - Brake or clutch lever assembly for motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR, GB | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MV AGUSTA MOTOR S.p.A. Via G. Macchi, 144 21100 Varese, VA / IT | [2007/17] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states M.V. AGUSTA S.p.A Via G.Macchi, 144 Località Schiranna 21100 Varese / IT | ||
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states MV Agusta Motorcycles S.p.A. Via G. Macchi, 144 Località Schiranna 21100 Varese / IT | ||
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states MV Agusta Motor S.p.A. Via G. Macchi, 144 (località Schiranna) 21100 Varese VA / IT | ||
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states Cagiva Motor S.p.A. 144, Via G. Macchi 21100 Varese / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tamburini, Massimo Via del Meridiano, 15 47895 Domagnano / SM | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Ripamonti, Enrico, et al Giambrocono & C. S.p.A. Via Rosolino Pilo, 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | Ripamonti, Enrico, et al Giambrocono & C. S.p.A. Via Rosolino Pilo, 19/b 20129 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1999/05] | Giambrocono, Alfonso, Dr. Ing., et al Ing. A. Giambrocono & C. S.r.l. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98113346.5 | 17.07.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | IT1997MI00562U | 23.07.1997 Original published format: IT MI970562 U | [1999/05] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0894704 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0894704 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | [2000/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0894704 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B62L3/02, B62K23/06 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
B62K11/14 (EP);
B62K23/06 (EP);
B62L3/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/12] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Brems- oder Kupplungs- Hebelanordnung für Motorfahrzeug | [1999/05] | English: | Brake or clutch lever assembly for motor vehicle | [1999/05] | French: | Assemblage de levier de freinage ou embrayage pour véhicule à moteur | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 13.01.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 19.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.02.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.12.2008 | NL | 31.12.2008 | ES | 11.04.2009 | GB | 17.07.2009 | FR | 31.07.2009 | [2010/28] |
Former [2010/05] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | NL | 31.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0100179 (AUTOMOTIVE PROD PLC [GB]) [X] 1-3 * abstract ** page 4, line 14 - line 17 * |