EP0898321 - Nickel-hydrogen storage battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu 570-8677 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/08] | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu 570-8677 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ise, Tadashi, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, 2-chome, Keihanhondori Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Ishimaru, Nobuyasu Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, 2-chome, Keihanhondori Moriguchi-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Kasuga, Hideo Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, 2-chome, Keihanhondori Moriguchi-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1999/08] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/26] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/08] | Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98113664.1 | 22.07.1998 | [1999/08] | Priority number, date | JP19970196193 | 22.07.1997 Original published format: JP 19619397 | [1999/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0898321 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0898321 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | [2000/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/34, H01M4/24, H01M2/26, H01M4/38 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
H01M4/383 (EP);
H01M10/34 (KR);
H01M50/536 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/345 (EP);
H01M50/538 (EP,KR,US);
H01M6/10 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/08] | H01M10/34, H01M4/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/39] |
Former [1999/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Nickel-Wasserstoff sekundär Batterie | [1999/08] | English: | Nickel-hydrogen storage battery | [1999/08] | French: | Batterie secondaire du type nickel-hydrogène | [1999/08] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 27.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/20] | 14.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4636445 (YAMANO MASARU [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,6 * column 2, line 22 - line 25 * * example 1 * * table 3 *; | [A]EP0523284 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * page 3, line 29 - line 40 * * page 5, line 56 - page 6, line 5 * * table 9 *; | [A]EP0723305 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * page 3, line 3 - line 20 * * page 4, line 43 - line 51 ** table 3 *; | [A]US5541017 (HONG KUOCHIH [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 18 - line 28 * * column 7, line 59 - line 65 * * column 8, line 32 - line 41 * * examples 2,3 * |