Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0895721
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.03.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] |
05.04.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] |
14.03.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.11.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
22.11.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.09.2001 |
First examination report |
|
12.09.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
31.07.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.07.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.03.2000 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
07.12.1999 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
04.11.1999 |
Change - extension states |
|
08.09.1999 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
03.09.1999 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
13.08.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.09.1999 [1999/39] |
23.12.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.02.1999 [1999/06] |