EP0880280 - Restricted information distribution system apparatus and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARKET DATA CORPORATION One Wall Street New York, NY 10005 / US | [1998/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nadan, Joseph S. 710 Flintrock Road Southport, CT 06490 / US | [1999/09] |
Former [1998/48] | 01 /
Nadan, Joseph S. 1520 York Avenue New York, NY 10028 / US | Representative(s) | Hogg, Jeffery Keith, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [2008/35] |
Former [1998/48] | Hogg, Jeffery Keith, et al Withers & Rogers, 4 Dyer's Buildings, Holborn London EC1N 2QP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98113864.7 | 07.05.1993 | [1998/48] | Priority number, date | US19920880582 | 08.05.1992 Original published format: US 880582 | [1998/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0880280 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0880280 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | [1999/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/167, H04N7/16 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
H04N7/1675 (EP,US);
H04L12/1804 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/48] | H04N7/167 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/48] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren für ein Nachrichtenverteilsystem mit beschränktem Zugang | [1998/48] | English: | Restricted information distribution system apparatus and methods | [1998/48] | French: | Appareil et prodécés pour un système de distribution restreinte d'information | [1998/48] | Examination procedure | 07.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 01.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/24] | 11.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/24] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93911167.0 / EP0593739 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0463451 (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]) [Y] 1-6,10-15 * page 2, column 1, line 7 - line 50 * * page 3, column 4, line 1 - page 7, column 11, line 12 * * figures 1-3 *; | [PY]US5142576 (NADAN JOSEPH S [US]) [PY] 1-6,10-15 * column 3, line 5 - column 6, line 62 ** figures 1-10 * |