EP0907097 - Optical parametric oscillator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wallenstein, Richard, Prof. Dr. Am Höllpfad 8 67271 Neuleiningen / DE | [2004/15] |
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states Wallenstein, Richard, Prof. Dr. Freundchenstrasse 10 67269 Grünstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wallenstein, Richard, Prof. Dr. Freundchenstrasse 10 67269 Grünstadt / DE | 02 /
Anstett, Gregor Trippstadter Strasse 121-308 67663 Kaiserslautern / DE | 03 /
Urschel, Rainer Kästenbergstrasse 48 67661 Kaiserlautern-Siegelbach / DE | 04 /
Borsutzky, Annette Morlauterer Strasse 88 67657 Kaiserslautern / DE | [1999/14] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | von Hellfeld, Axel, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98114079.1 | 28.07.1998 | [1999/14] | Priority number, date | DE1997142362 | 25.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19742362 | [1999/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0907097 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0907097 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0907097 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/39 | [1999/14] | CPC: |
G02F1/39 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2001/13] |
Former [1999/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optisch-parametrischer Oszillator | [1999/14] | English: | Optical parametric oscillator | [1999/14] | French: | Oscillateur paramétrique optique | [1999/14] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 13.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 03.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 29.11.2006 | GB | 29.11.2006 | IT | 29.11.2006 | NL | 29.11.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | GB | 29.11.2006 | |
IT | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
FR | 20.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | GB | 29.11.2006 | |
IT | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | NL | 29.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19511785 (HOYA CORP) [X] 1,2,4 * page 3, line 64 - page 5, line 67; figures 2-4,6,7 * [A] 3; | [XDA] - NABORS C D ET AL, "Optical parametric oscillator with bi-noncolinear, porro prism cavity", OSA TRENDS IN OPTICS AND PHOTONICS SERIES. VOL.10 ADVANCED SOLID STATE LASERS. FROM THE TOPICAL MEETING, OSA TRENDS IN OPTICS AND PHOTONICS SERIES. VOL.10 ADVANCED SOLID STATE LASERS FROM THE TOPICAL MEETING, ORLANDO, FL, USA, 27-29 JAN. 1997, 1997, Washington, DC, USA, Opt. Soc. America, USA, ISBN 1-55752-468-8, pages 90 - 93, XP002134920 [XD] 1,2 * page 90, column R, line 5 - page 93, column L; figure 2 * [A] 3 | [XD] - WU S ET AL, "SIMPLE, HIGH-PERFORMANCE TYPE II BETA-BAB2O4 OPTICAL PARAMETRIC OSCILLATOR", APPLIED OPTICS,US,OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA,WASHINGTON, (19970820), vol. 36, no. 24, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 5898 - 5901, XP000699710 [XD] 1,2 * page 5898, column R, line 3 - page 5899, column R, line 8; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.36.005898 | Examination | US5400173 |