EP0895192 - Method for reconstructing a three-dimensional object from a closed-loop sequence of images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 SH 249 Houston, Texas 77070 / US | ||
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states Compaq Computer Corporation 20555 S.H. 249 Houston Texas 77070 / US | ||
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 111 Powdermill Road Maynard, Massachusetts 01754 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kang, Sing Bing 1600 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Charig, Raymond Julian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Charig, Raymond Julian Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [1999/05] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98114093.2 | 28.07.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | US19970901391 | 28.07.1997 Original published format: US 901391 | [1999/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0895192 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0895192 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | [2001/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G06T11/00 | [2001/15] | CPC: |
G06T7/579 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/05] | G06T11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/02] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Rekonstruktion von dreidimensionalen Gegenständen aus geschlossenen Bildsequenzen | [1999/05] | English: | Method for reconstructing a three-dimensional object from a closed-loop sequence of images | [1999/05] | French: | Procédé de reconstruction d'un objet tridimensionnel à partir d'une séquence en boucle fermée d'images | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 19.10.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IT, NL | 20.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/31] | 10.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.11.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - SZELISKI R ET AL, "A parallel feature tracker for extended image sequences", PROCEEDINGS INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON COMPUTER VISION (CAT. NO.95TB100006), ISCV, CORAL GABLES, FL, USA, 21-23 NOV. 1995, 1995, Los Alamitos, CA, USA, IEEE Comput. Soc. Press, USA, ISBN 0-8186-7190-4, pages 241 - 246, XP002160564 [A] 1-16 * sections 3 to 5 * | [A] - SZELISKI R ET AL, "Recovering 3D shape and motion from image streams using nonlinear least squares", JOURNAL OF VISUAL COMMUNICATION AND IMAGE REPRESENTATION, MARCH 1994, USA, vol. 5, no. 1, ISSN 1047-3203, pages 10 - 28, XP000983099 [A] 1-16 * sections 1 and 7.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jvci.1994.1002 | [A] - HEYDEN A ET AL, "Euclidean reconstruction from image sequences with varying and unknown focal length and principal point", PROCEEDINGS. 1997 IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION (CAT. NO.97CB36082), SAN JUAN, PUERTO RICO, 17-19 JUNE 1997, 1997, Los Alamitos, CA, USA, IEEE Comput. Soc, USA, ISBN 0-8186-7822-4, pages 438 - 443, XP002160565 [A] 1-16 * section 1 * | [A] - VERRI A ET AL, "Aspect-based object recognition with size functions", PROCEEDINGS OF 13TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION, VIENNA, AUSTRIA, 25-29 AUG. 1996, 1996, Los Alamitos, CA, USA, IEEE Comput. Soc. Press, USA, ISBN 0-8186-7282-X, pages 682 - 686 vol.1, XP002160566 [A] 2-6 * section 2, paragraphs 3 and 4 * | [A] - GHOSH B K ET AL, "Calibration free visually controlled manipulation of parts in a robotic manufacturing workcell", PROCEEDINGS. 1996 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION (CAT. NO.96CH35857), MINNEAPOLIS, MN, USA, 22-28 APRIL 1996, 1996, New York, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, ISBN 0-7803-2988-0, pages 3197 - 3202 vol.4, XP002160567 [A] 14-16 * abstract * * section 2, paragraphs 4 and 5 * |