EP0881202 - Manufacturing method for hexafluorocyclobutane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakada, Tatsuo, Yodogawa Works of Daikin Ind. Ltd. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566 / JP | 02 /
Aoyama, Hirokazu c/o Yodogawa Works of Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1-1 Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566 / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Akinori c/o Yodogawa Works of Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1-1 Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566 / JP | [1998/49] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98114189.8 | 03.08.1994 | [1998/49] | Priority number, date | JP19930235531 | 27.08.1993 Original published format: JP 23553193 | JP19940012209 | 10.01.1994 Original published format: JP 1220994 | [1998/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0881202 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0881202 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07C23/06, C07C17/23, C07C17/281 | [1998/49] | CPC: |
C07C23/06 (EP,US);
B01J23/464 (EP,US);
C07C17/23 (EP,US);
C07C17/281 (EP,US);
C07C17/354 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/23, C07C23/06 (EP,US);
C07C17/281, C07C23/06 (US,EP);
C07C17/354, C07C23/06 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Hexafluorcyclobutan | [1998/49] | English: | Manufacturing method for hexafluorocyclobutane | [1998/49] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de l'héxafluorocyclobutane | [1998/49] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/49] | 21.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94923068.4 / EP0716065 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5136113 (RAO V N M [US]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE856145 (HOECHST AG) [Y] 1-8 * example 2 * | [Y] - HILAIRE L ET AL, "Hydrogénation catalytique de l'hexafluorocyclobutène", BULL. SOC. CHIM. FR. (BSCFAS);69; (3); PP.842-7, Fac. Sci.;Lab. Chim. Gen. B; Caen; Fr., XP002078697 [Y] 1-8 * page 843 * |