EP0895308 - Electrical connector for flat circuitry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle, Illinois 60532 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle Illinois 60532 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katsutoshi, Tojo Daisan Coshimo Corpo 4, 18-9 Kamitsurama 1-chome Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Shinsuke, Kunishi 3214-1 Soya Hadano-shi Kanagawa-Ken 257 / JP | [1999/16] |
Former [1999/05] | 01 /
Katsutoshi, Tojo 1610-406 Ogawa Machida-Si Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Shinsuke, Kunishi 3214-1 Soya Hadano-shi Kanagawa-Ken 257 / JP | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1999/05] | Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 98114250.8 | 30.07.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | JP19970220693 | 01.08.1997 Original published format: JP 22069397 | JP19970362849 | 12.12.1997 Original published format: JP 36284997 | JP19970362850 | 12.12.1997 Original published format: JP 36285097 | [1999/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0895308 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0895308 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | [2000/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/07 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
H01R12/592 (EP,US);
H01R12/78 (EP,US);
H01R12/83 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/36] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrischer Verbinder für flache Schaltungen | [1999/05] | English: | Electrical connector for flat circuitry | [1999/05] | French: | Connecteur électrique pour circuits plats | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/32] | 01.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/26] | 20.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0729204 (MOLEX INC [US]) [A] 1,7,9 * column 4, line 3 - column 2, line 29 *; | [A]EP0269248 (MOLEX INC [US]) [A] 1,7,9 * column 5, line 39 - column 10, line 42 *; | [A]US4944690 (IMAI AKIRA [JP]) [A] 1,7,9 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 54 *; | [A]US4734053 (IMAI AKIRA [JP]) [A] 1,7,9 * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 34 *; | [A]JPH0883652 ; | [A]US5816845 (CHISHIMA MASAMITSU [JP], et al) [A] 1,7,9 * column 6, line 43 - column 18, line 5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 1996, no. 07, & JP08083652 A 19960326 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYST LTD) [A] 1,7,9 * abstract * |