blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0898059

EP0898059 - Decompression valve engine brake [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  27.09.2002
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 13.11.2002  [2002/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
[1999/14]
Former [1999/08]For all designated states
Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft
Postfach 80 02 30
70546 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Fränkle, Gerhard, Dr.
Lehenstrasse 42
73630 Remshalden / DE
02 / Hoffmann, Michael
Pfahlbühlstrasse 71
71384 Weinstadt / DE
[1999/08]
Application number, filing date98114353.030.07.1998
[1999/08]
Priority number, dateDE199713582218.08.1997         Original published format: DE 19735822
[1999/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0898059
Date:24.02.1999
Language:DE
[1999/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0898059
Date:15.03.2000
[2000/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.02.2000
ClassificationIPC:F01L13/06, F01L9/02
[1999/08]
CPC:
F01L13/06 (EP,US); F02B21/00 (EP,US); F02D13/04 (EP,US);
F02D9/06 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/47]
Former [1999/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Dekompressionsventil-Motorbremse[1999/08]
English:Decompression valve engine brake[1999/08]
French:Frein moteur à soupape de décompression[1999/08]
Examination procedure12.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
15.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5404852  (FRAENKLE GERHARD [DE]) [Y] 1,3,5,9,11,16-18 * column 1, lines 44-65 * * column 2, lines 4-8,67,68 * * column 3, lines 1,2 * * column 4, lines 8-10 *;
 [YA]US5309881  (PAWELLEK FRANZ [DE], et al) [Y] 1,3,5,9,11,16-18 * abstract * [A] 4,12;
 [A]US4987869  (HILBURGER WALTER [DE]) [A] 6 * page 1 *;
 [PA]DE19654449  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [PA] 8 * figure 4 *;
 [A]US4811558  (BAUGH BENTON F [US]) [A] 10 * page 1 *;
 [A]DE2502650  (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG) [A] 13 * page 5 *;
 [A]US5609134  (SCHMIDT ERWIN [DE], et al) [A] 14 * column 6, lines 36-38 *
by applicantDE4309860
    - MTZ, MOTORTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT 56, (1995), vol. 7, no. 8
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.