EP0977105 - Regulator with current limiting function, and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [2000/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kadanka, Petr Vitezna 1745 75661 Roznov p.R. / CZ | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Richardt, Markus Albert Motorola GmbH Hagenauerstrasse 47 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Richardt, Markus Albert Motorola GmbH, Hagenauerstrasse 47 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2000/05] | Richardt, Markus Albert Motorola GmbH, Intellectual Property Dept., Hagenauerstrasse 47 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 98114383.7 | 31.07.1998 | [2000/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0977105 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G05F3/22 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
G05F3/225 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/41] |
Former [2000/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Regler mit Strombegrenzungsfunktion und Verfahren dazu | [2000/05] | English: | Regulator with current limiting function, and method | [2000/05] | French: | Régulateur avec fonction de limitation de courant et méthode | [2000/05] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 10.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/15] | 21.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5550462 (NAKAJIMA AKIO) [X] 1,6,7,10 * the whole document * [A] 2-5,8,9; | [A]US4914317 (AGIMAN DAN) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0735452 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4300592 (TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRON) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5644217 (KUSABA KATSUMI) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |