EP0894772 - Method and apparatus for delivering a cased glass stream [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER INC. Three O-I Plaza One Michael Owens Way Perrysburg, OH 43551-2999 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER INC. One Sea Gate Toledo, Ohio 43666 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scott, Garrett L. 2424 S. James Wood Blvd. Toledo, Ohio 43617 / US | 02 /
Fenstermacher, James H. 2411 Heathcoe Court Maumee, OH 43537 / US | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1999/05] | Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 98114407.4 | 31.07.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | US19970903785 | 31.07.1997 Original published format: US 903785 | [1999/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0894772 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0894772 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | [1999/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0894772 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C03B7/084, C03B7/08, C03B7/082 | [1999/15] | CPC data not yet available |
Former IPC [1999/05] | C03B7/084, C03B7/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/52] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | 08.10.1999 | LT | 08.10.1999 | LV | 08.10.1999 | RO | 08.10.1999 | SI | 08.10.1999 | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung eines Überfangglasstroms | [2002/45] | English: | Method and apparatus for delivering a cased glass stream | [1999/05] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour délivrer un courant de verre doublé | [1999/05] |
Former [1999/05] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Abliefern eines Überfangglasstroms | Examination procedure | 08.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 18.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB114583 (MCCAULEY ROBERT EMMETT [US]) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2021523 (SLICK JR EDWIN E) [Y] 1,2* the whole document *; | [Y]EP0722907 (OWENS BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER [US]) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document * |