EP0896202 - Array element examination method and array element examination device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOYA CORPORATION 7-5 Nakaochiai 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/06] | For all designated states HOYA CORPORATION 7-5 Nakaochiai 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaura, Hitoshi 5-16-7-205, Mihori-cho Akishima-shi, Tokyo 196-0001 / JP | [1999/06] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/06] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 98114769.7 | 06.08.1998 | [1999/06] | Priority number, date | JP19970214528 | 08.08.1997 Original published format: JP 21452897 | [1999/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0896202 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0896202 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | [2000/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38, G01B11/14, G01B11/02 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
G01B11/14 (EP,US);
G01B11/024 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/06] | G01B11/14, G01B11/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/24] |
Former [1999/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Inspektion eines Elementes einer Anordnung | [1999/06] | English: | Array element examination method and array element examination device | [1999/06] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour examiner un élément de zone | [1999/06] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 01.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/36] | 07.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0961666 ; | [A]EP0757227 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1,7 * column 11, line 50 - column 14, line 25; figures 3A-3C *; | [A]US5102227 (ZWIRNER KURT [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * figure 9B *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 07, & JP09061666 A 19970307 (NIPPON TELEGR &TELEPH CORP | [A] - OZAWA K ET AL, "HIGH-SPEED MEASURING EQUIPMENT OF FIBER CORE POSITION OF OPTICAL FIBER ARRAY USING PIEZO ACTUATOR", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19950521), ISBN 0-7803-1966-4, pages 672 - 678, XP000657251 [A] 1,7 * paragraph [04.4]; figure 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ROBOT.1995.525361 |