EP0895759 - An angioplasty stent, particularly for treating aorto-ostial and ostial lesions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SORIN BIOMEDICA CARDIO S.p.A. Via Crescentino 13040 Saluggia (Vercelli) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/06] | For all designated states SORIN BIOMEDICA CARDIO S.p.A. Via Crescentino I-13040 Saluggia, Vercelli / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartorelli, Antonio Via Beretta 2 20121 Milano / IT | 02 /
Vallana, Franco Via S. Massimo 28 10123 Torino / IT | [1999/06] | Representative(s) | Bosotti, Luciano, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Bosotti, Luciano, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl Via Maria Vittoria, 18 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1999/50] | Bosotti, Luciano, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Corso Fiume 6 10133 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1999/06] | Bosotti, Luciano, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 98114805.9 | 06.08.1998 | [1999/06] | Priority number, date | IT1997TO00728 | 08.08.1997 Original published format: IT TO970728 | [1999/06] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0895759 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [1999/06] | CPC: |
A61F2/915 (EP);
A61F2/91 (EP);
A61F2002/91525 (EP);
A61F2002/91541 (EP);
A61F2002/91558 (EP);
A61F2250/0018 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1999/42] |
Former [1999/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stent für Angioplastie, insbesondere zur Behandlung von aorta-ostialen und ostialen Verletzungen | [1999/06] | English: | An angioplasty stent, particularly for treating aorto-ostial and ostial lesions | [1999/06] | French: | Stent pour angioplastie, en particulier pour le traitement des lesions aorto-ostiales et ostiales | [1999/06] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/37] | 11.08.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 22.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/37] | 07.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.09.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   18.09.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9532757 (NITINOL MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES I [US]) [X] 1,2,8,11 * page 8, line 14 - line 19; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0045627 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, paragraph 2; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0541443 (MEADOX FRANCE [FR]) | by applicant | US4776337 | US4800882 | US4907336 | US4886062 | US4830003 | US4856516 |