EP0898155 - Feed assembly for discharging a flowable material in a dosing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANN + HUMMEL ProTec GmbH Grönerstrasse 44-50 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/08] | For all designated states Mann + Hummel ProTec GmbH Grönerstrasse 44-50 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vollmar, Hartmut Zur Hardt 18 53773 Heneff-Rott / DE | [1999/08] | Representative(s) | Voth, Gerhard Mann+Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Voth, Gerhard Mann+Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | ||
Former [1999/08] | Voth, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. FILTERWERK MANN + HUMMEL GMBH Postfach 4 09 71631 Ludwigsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98115046.9 | 11.08.1998 | [1999/08] | Priority number, date | DE1997214642U | 16.08.1997 Original published format: DE 29714642 U | [1999/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0898155 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0898155 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01G19/32 | [1999/08] | CPC: |
G01G19/32 (EP,US);
G01G11/086 (US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/44] |
Former [1999/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zufuhrvorrichtung für ein rieselfähiges Aufgabegut in eine Dosiervorrichtung | [1999/08] | English: | Feed assembly for discharging a flowable material in a dosing device | [1999/08] | French: | Assemblage d'alimentation pour décharger un matériau coulant dans un dispositif de dosage | [1999/08] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 14.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 06.10.2004 | DK | 06.01.2005 | SE | 06.01.2005 | ES | 17.01.2005 | [2007/17] |
Former [2006/14] | NL | 06.10.2004 | |
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | DK | 06.01.2005 | |
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | ES | 17.01.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2264466 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER) [A] 1* page 5, paragraph 1; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US5148943 (MOLLER RICHARD W [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 33 - line 43; figure 3 *; | [A]DE9214622U (VOLLMAR HARTMUT) [A] 1 * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 26; figure 1 *; | [PX]DE29714642U (VOLLMAR HARTMUT [DE]) [PX] 1-14 * the whole document * |