blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0897110

EP0897110 - Material testing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.07.2009
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.08.2009  [2009/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Japan Tobacco Inc.
2-1 Toranomon, 2-Chome Minato-Ku
Tokyo 105 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/07]For all designated states
Japan Tobacco Inc.
2-1 Toranomon, 2-Chome
Minato-Ku Tokyo 105 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ishii, Yuzo
c/o JT Tohsi Inc., 202, Aza Kitajima
Kitajima-cho, Toyohashi-shi, Aichi / JP
02 / Matsumoto, Masayuki
c/o JT Tohsi Inc., 202, Aza Kitajima
Kitajima-cho, Toyohashi-shi, Aichi / JP
03 / Takahashi, Nobunari
c/o JT Tohsi Inc., 202, Aza Kitajima
Kitajima-cho, Toyohashi-shi, Aichi / JP
04 / Kamio, Susumu, c/o Nittetsu Elex Co., Ltd.
Edamitsu Center, 1786-16, Edamitsu
Yahatahigashi-ku, Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka / JP
05 / Yamashita, Katsumi, c/o Nittetsu Elex Co., Ltd.
Edamitsu Center, 1786-16, Edamitsu
Yahatahigashi-ku, Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka / JP
[1999/07]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth
Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/07]Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
Application number, filing date98115079.011.08.1998
[1999/07]
Priority number, dateJP1997021854713.08.1997         Original published format: JP 21854797
JP1997021854813.08.1997         Original published format: JP 21854897
JP1997021854913.08.1997         Original published format: JP 21854997
[1999/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0897110
Date:17.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0897110
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:G01N3/10, G05D15/01, G05D17/02, G05D3/00, G05B13/04
[2000/02]
CPC:
G01N3/10 (EP,US); G01N3/00 (KR); G05B19/33 (EP,US);
G05D15/01 (EP,US); G05B2219/37206 (EP,US); G05B2219/41029 (EP,US);
G05B2219/41388 (EP,US); G05B2219/50073 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1999/07]G01N3/10, G05D15/01, G05D17/02, G05D3/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/39]
Former [2000/38]GB 
Former [1999/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Maschine zur Prüfung von Werkstoffen[1999/07]
English:Material testing machine[1999/07]
French:Dispositif d'essai de matériaux[1999/07]
Examination procedure03.09.1998Examination requested  [1999/07]
08.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/34]
03.04.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2009/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
31.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
31.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200811   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH03248033  ;
 [A]JPH09203700  ;
 [A]US4235114  (MOHLER DAVID B [US]) [A] 1-10 * column A *;
 [A]GB2205959  (NORTHERN ENG IND) [A] 1-10 * page 3 - page 6; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US4802367  (PETERSEN NIEL R [US], et al) [Y] 3,9 * column 3, line 54 - column 17, line 68; figures 1-4 *;
 [XY]US5511431  (HINTON CHRISTOPHER E [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 4, line 29 - column 6, line 64; figures 1-4 * [Y] 3,9
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920131), vol. 016, no. 042, Database accession no. (P - 1306), & JP03248033 A 19911106 (SHIMADZU CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP09203700 A 19970805 (SHIMADZU CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.