EP0901969 - One-piece blank made of foldable material for creating a packaging body for bottles to be inserted in a plastics bottle crate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.04.2001 [2001/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wanfried-Druck Kalden GmbH Postfach 1242 D-37278 Wanfried / DE | [1999/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mann, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Untertor 1 37281 Wanfried / DE | [1999/11] | Representative(s) | Jahn-Held, Wilhelm W. Schöne Aussicht 8 34355 Staufenberg-Landwehrhagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | Jahn-Held, Wilhelm W., Dr.Dr.-Ing. Schöne Aussicht 8 34355 Staufenberg-Landwehrhagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98115142.6 | 12.08.1998 | [1999/11] | Priority number, date | DE1997216402U | 12.09.1997 Original published format: DE 29716402 U | [1999/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0901969 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0901969 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/00, B65B21/24, B65B11/10 | [1999/11] | CPC: |
B65D71/14 (EP);
B65D2571/00141 (EP);
B65D2571/00277 (EP);
B65D2571/0029 (EP);
B65D2571/00456 (EP);
B65D2571/0066 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU [1999/48] |
Former [1999/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einteiliger Zuschnitt aus faltbarem Material zur Bildung eines Verpackungskörpers für Flaschen zum Einsatz in Kunststoff-Flaschenkästen | [1999/11] | English: | One-piece blank made of foldable material for creating a packaging body for bottles to be inserted in a plastics bottle crate | [1999/11] | French: | Flan monobloc en matériau pliable pour créer un corps d'emballage pour bouteilles à insérer dans un casier à bouteilles en matière plastique | [1999/11] | Examination procedure | 20.07.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 11.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/15] | 20.04.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 20.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.09.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, MC, NL, PT, SE | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.10.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1968877 (CUBBERLEY AMARIAH H) [A] 1,4-8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2357979 (SPUMALIT ANSTALT) [A] 1,4,5,7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0024451 (CERTIPAK CORP [US]) [A] 10* figures 1-6; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0027526 (OSTHUSHENRICH KG [DE]) [A] 10 * figure 1 *; | [XA]EP0030322 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,7 * figures 1,2 * [A] 4-6,8; | [XA]EP0512809 (MEAD CORP [US]) [X] 1,7 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 6; figures 1-3 * [A] 4-6,8 |