EP0900688 - Head rest for a vehicle seat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/14] |
Former [1999/10] | For all designated states Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Breitner, Roland, Dr. Kirchhalde 20 71083 Herrenberg / DE | 02 /
Heckmann, Thomas Hanfbergstrasse 8/4 71134 Aidlingen / DE | [1999/10] | Application number, filing date | 98115210.1 | 13.08.1998 | [1999/10] | Priority number, date | DE1997139131 | 06.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19739131 | [1999/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0900688 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0900688 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/42, B60N2/48 | [1999/10] | CPC: |
B60N2/865 (EP,US);
B60N2/838 (EP,US);
B60N2/888 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2002/03] |
Former [1999/47] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE | ||
Former [1999/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kopfstütze für einen Fahrzeugsitz | [1999/10] | English: | Head rest for a vehicle seat | [1999/10] | French: | Appuie-tête pour un siège de véhicule | [1999/10] | Examination procedure | 30.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 06.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4720146 (MAWBEY GERALD W [US], et al) [Y] 1,4,5,7 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 3 * * column 3, line 59 - line 68; figures 1-3 * [A] 2,3,6; | [Y]US5468045 (WEBER JAMES L [US]) [Y] 1,4,5,7 * column 3, line 4 - column 5, line 15; figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE2152202 (OPEL ADAM AG) [A] 1-7 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 4 * * page 8, line 8 - page 9, line 1; figures 1,2,6-8 *; | [AD]DE2220267 (MATSURA HIROTSUGU) [AD] 1 * figures 1,2,8-11; claims 1-5 *; | [AD]DE3900495 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [AD] 1 * figures 1-4; claims 1-3,9,11,13 * |