EP0979639 - Method for making fibrous loop member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Jörg Alte Haingasse 15 61184 Karben / DE | 02 /
Stiehl, Gabriele Neustrasse 3 65824 Schwalbach/Ts. / DE | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2000/07] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al Procter & Gamble, European Service GmbH 65823 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 98115225.9 | 13.08.1998 | [2000/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0979639 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [2000/07] | CPC: |
A61F13/495 (EP);
A61F13/15577 (EP);
A61F13/51104 (EP);
A61F13/537 (EP);
A61F13/627 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/43] |
Former [2000/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Faserschlingenelementes | [2000/07] | English: | Method for making fibrous loop member | [2000/07] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un element fibreux à boucle | [2000/09] |
Former [2000/07] | Procédé de fabrication d'un élément fibreux à boucle | Examination procedure | 17.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/17] | 23.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.09.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.09.2000 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0626159 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 23 - line 53 *; | [DA]WO9505139 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [DA] 1* page 9, line 27 - line 29 *; | [A]EP0738505 (PANTEX SRL [IT]) [A] 1,3-5 * column 1, line 31 - line 32 * * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 15 * * figure 1 * |