EP0903636 - Thermal assisted photosensitive composition and process for formation of fine conductor lines utilizing such composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Felten, John James 615 Cedar Run Lane Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27516 / US | [1999/12] | Representative(s) | Towler, Philip Dean, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | Towler, Philip Dean, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98115315.8 | 14.08.1998 | [1999/12] | Priority number, date | US19970936485 | 18.09.1997 Original published format: US 936485 | [1999/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0903636 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0903636 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | [2000/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0903636 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/004, G03F7/027, G03F7/38 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
H05K3/02 (EP,US);
G03F7/033 (KR);
G03F7/0007 (KR);
G03F7/0047 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/038 (KR);
G03F7/0388 (KR);
|
Former IPC [1999/12] | G03F7/004, G03F7/027 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/46] |
Former [1999/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Durch Wärme unterstützte photoempfindliche Zusammensetzung und Verfahren zur Anwendung dieser Zusammensetzung zur Erzeugung feiner Leiterbahnen | [1999/12] | English: | Thermal assisted photosensitive composition and process for formation of fine conductor lines utilizing such composition | [1999/12] | French: | Composition photosensible assistée thermiquement et méthode d'utilisation de cette composition dans la fabrication de lignes conductrices fines | [1999/12] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 15.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2119810 (GRACE W R & CO) [A] 1-4,10-15 * page 2, line 6 - line 23 * * page 4, line 9 - line 12 * * page 5, line 49 - line 56 ** example 11 *; | [A]EP0414166 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0418733 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,10,12,14 * page 3, line 20 - line 34 * * page 5, line 37 - line 41 * * example 1 * |