EP0898094 - Improved isolation system for vibratory equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FMC Technologies, Inc. 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago, IL 60601 / US | [2002/40] |
Former [1999/08] | For all designated states FMC CORPORATION 1735 Market Street Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Patterson, Harold E. R.D.6, Box 184 Indiana, Pennsylvania 15701 / US | 02 /
Sleppy, Paul I. Box 205c R.D.1 Penn Run, Pennsylvania 15764 / US | 03 /
Marshall, Kenneth M. R.D.1, Box 146g Indiana, Pennsylvania 15701 / US | [1999/08] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/08] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost - Altenburg - Geissler - Isenbruck, Gallileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98115419.8 | 17.08.1998 | [1999/08] | Priority number, date | US19970912492 | 18.08.1997 Original published format: US 912492 | [1999/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0898094 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0898094 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | [2001/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16F13/10, F16F3/10, F16F15/08 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
F16F15/085 (EP,US);
F16F3/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/08] | F16F13/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2001/39] |
Former [1999/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbessertes Schwingungsdämpfungssystem für eine schwingende Anlage | [1999/08] | English: | Improved isolation system for vibratory equipment | [1999/08] | French: | Système d'isolation des vibrations amélioré pour une installation vibrante | [1999/08] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/16] | 17.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/28] | 15.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE898005 (TRANSIT RES CORP) [X] 1,2,6-8,15-20 * figure 3 * [A] 5; | [X]US3721417 (SKALA D, et al) [X] 1-4,9-11 * figure - *; | [X]US3223400 (DEISTER JR EMIL E) [X] 1,2,6-8,12-14 * figure - *; | [X]GB979443 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG) [X] 1,9-11 * page 1, lines 64-79; figure . *; | [A]FR1120480 (GOMMA ANTIVIBRANTI APPLIC) [A] 15-17 * figure . *; | [A]JPS6449735 ; | [A]US4934650 (LEKUCH HERBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 2,4 *; | [A]GB1001163 (VIBRACHOC SA) [A] 3 * page 3, lines 49-63; figure - *; | [A]US2103946 (HERR JOHN H) [A] 3 * figure 3 *; | [A]US2189708 (COYNE JOHN J) [A] 19,20 * figure - *; | [A]EP0045248 (PINEAU ANDRE LUCIEN) [A] 19,20 * figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890605), vol. 013, no. 237, Database accession no. (M - 833), & JP01049735 A 19890227 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-20 * abstract * |