EP0899394 - Packing sleeve for pipe passages through roof surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dätwyler AG Gummi- und Kunststoffe 6467 Schattdorf / CH | [1999/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herwegh, Norbert Vordermühlebach 2 6345 Beckenried / CH | 02 /
Ott, Kurt Sennhofstrasse 36 5453 Remtschwil / CH | [1999/09] | Representative(s) | Hefel, Herbert Egelseestrasse 65a Postfach 61 6800 Feldkirch / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | Hefel, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Egelseestrasse 65a Postfach 61 6800 Feldkirch / AT | Application number, filing date | 98115475.0 | 18.08.1998 | [1999/09] | Priority number, date | AT19970001420 | 25.08.1997 Original published format: AT 142097 | [1999/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0899394 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0899394 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | [2001/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/14, E04D13/147 | [1999/09] | CPC: |
E04D13/1476 (EP);
E04D13/1407 (EP);
F16L5/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/01] |
Former [1999/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Dichtmanschette für Rohrdurchführungen an Dachflächen | [1999/09] | English: | Packing sleeve for pipe passages through roof surfaces | [1999/09] | French: | Manchon d'étanchéité pour passages de tuyaux à travers des surfaces de toiture | [1999/09] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/34] | 27.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.11.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.11.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5222334 (HASTY WILLIAM E [US]) [X] 1,2,9 * column 6, line 59 - column 7, line 32; figures 4,6,7 * [A] 3-8,10; | [A]AT367140B (SCHOOP TRAUGOTT [CH]) [A] 1,2 * page 2, line 53 - page 3, line 34; figures 1-3 *; | [A]GB1310003 (BAMBROUGH G W BAMBROUGH ASSOCI) [A] 1,9 * page 2, line 122 - line 130; figure 7 *; | [A]US4010578 (LOGSDON DUANE D) [A] 3 * abstract *; | [A]FR2672626 (MUELINK & GROL BV [NL]) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraph L - page 3; figure - *; | [A]GB383414 (JAMES HENRY DAVIES) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4184414 (JARNOT FRANK R [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | by applicant | US3677576 | US4278262 | DE4221762 | DD259520 |