EP0898996 - Process and device for the regeneration of filter material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maier & Partner Abwassertechnik Vertriebs-GmbH Königswall 8 48249 Dülmen / DE | [1999/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kersting, Wolfgang Haverlandweg 103 48249 Dülmen / DE | 02 /
Maier, Alois Bergerhausen 5 87719 Mindelheim / DE | 03 /
Schropp, Christian Poststrasse 1 87776 Sontheim b. Memmingen / DE | [1999/09] | Representative(s) | Fiener, Josef, et al Patentanw. J. Fiener et col. P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | Fiener, Josef, et al Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener et col., P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 98115509.6 | 18.08.1998 | [1999/09] | Priority number, date | DE1997135672 | 18.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19735672 | [1999/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0898996 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0898996 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01D24/46 | [1999/09] | CPC: |
B01D24/165 (EP);
B01D24/40 (EP);
B01D24/4689 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL [1999/50] |
Former [1999/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Regenerieren eines Filtermaterials | [1999/09] | English: | Process and device for the regeneration of filter material | [1999/09] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la régénération du matériau de filtre | [1999/09] | Examination procedure | 30.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 01.11.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 13.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/37] | 10.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/37] | Request for further processing for: | 10.04.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 10.04.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.05.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.11.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9403254 (MERPRO TORTEK LTD ;SMITH ROBERT MELVILLE (GB); ADAMS JOHN EDWARD () [X] 1,4 * page 6, line 13 - page 7, line 15; figure 1 * [A] 2,3,5-10; | [XA]DE2401627 (CHRIST AG THEODOR) [X] 1,4 * page 5, line 5 - page 10, line 13; figure . * [A] 2,3,5-10; | [XA]DE2137428 (HYDROMATION FILTER CO) [X] 1,4 * page 9, line 4 - page 13, line 5; figures 1-3 * [A] 2,3,5-10; | [AD]DE4210571 (HOMPF, D.) [AD] 1-10 * figure 1 *; | [AD]DE2630195 (PACIK DANIEL DIPL ING) [AD] 1-10 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0269261 (BURNETT & ROLFE LTD) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-8 * |