EP0899102 - Inkjet head control system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI XEROX CO., LTD. 17-22, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states FUJI XEROX CO., LTD. 17-22, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kondou, Masaaki c/o NEC Niigata, Ltd. 7546, Oaza Yasuda Kashiwazaki-shi, Niigata / JP | [1999/09] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98115526.0 | 18.08.1998 | [1999/09] | Priority number, date | JP19970221660 | 18.08.1997 Original published format: JP 22166097 | [1999/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0899102 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0899102 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | [1999/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/045 | [1999/09] | CPC: |
B41J2/04541 (EP,US);
B41J2/0457 (EP,US);
B41J2/04581 (EP,US);
B41J2/04588 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2000/33] |
Former [1999/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Tintenstrahlkopfsteuerungssystem und Steuerverfahren | [1999/09] | English: | Inkjet head control system and method | [1999/09] | French: | Système de contrôle d'une tête à jet d'encre et procédé de contrôle | [1999/09] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1999 | Examination requested [1999/52] | 22.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.09.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [D]JPH08112894 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]JPH09201963 ; | [A]JPH09187949 ; | [DA]JPH06182993 | [A] - WPI, DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD., LONDON, GB, XP002117621 [A] 1,9,15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 199, no. 712, & JP09201963 A 19970805 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1,9,15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 199, no. 711, & JP09187949 A 19970722 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1,9,15 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941005), vol. 18, no. 526, Database accession no. (M - 1683), & JP06182993 A 19940705 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [DA] 1,9,15 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH06182993 | JPH08112894 |