EP0897858 - Mounting device for boats [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Förthmann, Peter Bandwirkerstrasse 39-41 22041 Hamburg / DE | [1999/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/08] | Representative(s) | Schumacher, Horst Palgen, Schumacher & Kollegen Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [1999/08] | Schumacher, Horst, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte, PALGEN SCHUMACHER & KLUIN, Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98115602.9 | 19.08.1998 | [1999/08] | Priority number, date | DE1997214722U | 19.08.1997 Original published format: DE 29714722 U | [1999/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0897858 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0897858 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B63B29/20, B63B17/00, B63H25/04 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
B63H25/04 (EP,US);
B63B17/00 (EP,US);
B63B27/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/08] | B63B29/20, B63B17/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2001/30] |
Former [1999/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Befestigungssystem zur Verwendung auf Booten | [1999/08] | English: | Mounting device for boats | [1999/08] | French: | Système de fixation pour bateaux | [1999/08] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 09.05.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 06.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2003/01] | 01.08.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.06.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1123300 (BERGON) [A] 1-7 * column W *; | [A]US5615854 (NOMURA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,3-7 * column 4, line 49 - line 67; figure 9 *; | [A]EP0243942 (FOERTHMANN PETER [DE]) [A] 1 * column 9, line 18 - line 38; figures 1,2 * |