EP0980991 - Magneto-rheological torsional vibration damper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIBRATECH, INC. 11980 Walden Avenue Alden New York 14004-9790 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | For all designated states Vibratech, Inc. 11980 Walden Avenue Alden, New York 14004-9790 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mokeddem, Mohamed 63 White Road Cheektowaga, New York 14225 / US | [2000/08] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98115632.6 | 19.08.1998 | [2000/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0980991 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/173, F16F9/53 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
F16F15/173 (EP,US);
F16F9/535 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2122 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2127 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/08] | Title | German: | Magnetorheologischer Torsionsschwingungsdämpfer | [2000/08] | English: | Magneto-rheological torsional vibration damper | [2000/08] | French: | Amortisseur de vibrations torsionelles magnétorhéologique | [2000/08] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 18.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/02] | 06.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2002 | 31.08.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5007303 (OKUZUMI HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 8,9 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 20; figure - * [A] 1,12; | [X]US5553514 (WALKOWC JANUSZ [US]) [X] 8,9 * column 4, lines 55-61 * * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 18; figure - *; | [A]DE19518672 (FEV MOTORENTECH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,12 * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 28; figure - *; | [A]US4942947 (SHTARKMAN EMIL M [US]) [A] 1,8,12 * column 7, lines 29-56; figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]DE19621460 (PALSIS SCHWINGUNGSTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,12 * figure 1 * |