EP0982527 - Lubricant dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.04.2001 [2001/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DE LIMON FLUHME GMBH Arminstrasse 15 D-40227 Düsseldorf / DE | [2000/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morgenstern, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Schumannstrasse 78 40822 Mettmann / DE | 02 /
Follert, Wolfgang Am Flinsbach 1 44229 Dortmund / DE | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 98115883.5 | 22.08.1998 | [2000/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0982527 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16N13/02, F16N7/38 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
F16N7/385 (EP);
F16N11/08 (EP);
F16N11/10 (EP);
F16N13/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [2000/45] |
Former [2000/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | SI | 27.01.2000 | Title | German: | Schmierstoffgeber | [2000/09] | English: | Lubricant dispenser | [2000/09] | French: | Distributeur de lubrifiant | [2000/09] | Examination procedure | 24.03.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 30.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, FI, GR, IE, MC, PT | 06.02.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.09.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2188785 (MCCORD CORP [US]) [X] 1,4,7 * page 4, line 2 - page 8, line 15; figure - *; | [X]US5667037 (ORLITZKY ANTON [CA]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 55 - column 4, line 7; figure - *; | [A]DE19544692 (SATZINGER GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,3 * abstract *; | [A]US5285871 (SIEVENPIPER DONALD A [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 41 - column 5, line 27; figure - *; | [A]EP0244182 (CASTROL LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19544692 |